AlDosari, Hossam Abdullah Sulaiman Almassary (CPSO#: 96524)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 16 Jan 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jan 2013