Al-Dubayan, Nadir Adnan Yousef (CPSO#: 76919)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 26 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 26 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Jul 2003 to 26 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 27 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 12 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2006