Al-Enazy, Hadi Saeed Ahmed (CPSO#: 78389)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jul 2005 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2003 to 30 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2016