Al-Enezi, Ahmad Nahis Ashwi (CPSO#: 82837)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Newcastle-Upon-Tyne, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 2005 to 08 Jul 2005
PEAP - Resident - Urology

McMaster University, 09 Jul 2005 to 07 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 08 Jul 2006 to 07 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 08 Jul 2007 to 07 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 08 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010