Al-Enezi, Saleh Ali Falah Lafi (CPSO#: 73013)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jul 2000
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2000