Al-Enizi, Fahad Ghali Shareedah Jlewy (CPSO#: 75732)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Oct 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 24 Oct 2002
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2002