Al-Etani, Habib Yousef Sharif Afandi (CPSO#: 64834)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 11 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1997