Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Al-Etebi, Fatma Ali (CPSO#: 67513)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 26 Sep 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
Resident 5 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Sep 1999
Resident 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1999