Al-Fadhli, Eid Rahi Hussain Hazza (CPSO#: 74383)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Oct 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 30 Oct 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 27 Oct 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2000 to 27 Oct 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Oct 2001 to 27 Oct 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2002