Al-Faifi, Salem Mohammed Ahmed (CPSO#: 68529)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 24 Aug 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Aug 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Aug 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1999 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2001