Al-Faify, Ahmad Masaud K (CPSO#: 85495)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 10 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Aug 2007