Al-Faleh, Khalid Marji Saleh (CPSO#: 75559)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2000 to 31 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2005
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014