Al-Fardan, Zuhair Ali Ibrahim (CPSO#: 78324)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:United Arab Emirates University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 14 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 15 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2003 to 15 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2004 to 15 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2005 to 15 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 15 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007