Al-Fares, Abdulrahman A A A (CPSO#: 107705)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 24 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 4166180484
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Kuwait

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULRAHMAN A A A AL-FARES shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL-FARES is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL-FARES shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-FARES is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL-FARES shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL-FARES is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL-FARES no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018