Al-Farra, Bassel (CPSO#: 53413)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Aleppo, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2224 Walker Road
Suite 115
Windsor ON  N8W 3P5
Phone: (519) 254-9906
Fax: (519) 254-8301
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Al-Farra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 2 2009


Corporation Name: Al-Farra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 10 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Al-Farra ( CPSO# 53413 )

Business Address:
Suite 115
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 254-9906

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BASSEL AL-FARRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-FARRA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1990