Al-Farsi, Nouf Humaid Zaal (CPSO#: 100201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jun 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 4169786294
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Oman

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NOUF HUMAID ZAAL AL-FARSI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL-FARSI is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. AL-FARSI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-FARSI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL-FARSI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL-FARSI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL-FARSI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PEAP - Resident - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 07 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 08 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 07 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 08 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018