Al-Fawaz, Tariq Saleh Ali (CPSO#: 87857)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 21 Jan 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 22 Jan 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008