Al-Fiar, Fahad Zamel Okab (CPSO#: 68487)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 May 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1997