Al-Fifi, Yahya Salim Yahya Mater (CPSO#: 68532)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Oct 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 01 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 01 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2004