Al-Foheidi Al-Harbi, Meteb Owaish (CPSO#: 80648)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Apr 2004 to 27 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 May 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007