Al-Gahtani, Farjah Hassan (CPSO#: 82300)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 18 Apr 2005 to 12 Jun 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 13 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Apr 2007
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Apr 2007