Al-Gahtani, Hussein Abdulrahman Saleh (CPSO#: 69810)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 31 May 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Feb 1996 to 15 Mar 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Mar 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 15 Mar 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Mar 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 15 Mar 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Mar 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 15 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Mar 2000 to 15 Mar 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Mar 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2001