Al-Garni, Abdulaziz Saleh F (CPSO#: 83881)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 May 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 May 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Dec 2005 to 11 Jan 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 May 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2008