Al-Garni, Ali Saad Mohammad Fayez (CPSO#: 78350)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 23 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Nov 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 23 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 23 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 24 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 23 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 2005