Al-Gasim, Abeer Abdu Moteeei (CPSO#: 83710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 SHERBOUNE STREET , SUITE 202
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: 647-748-7414
Fax: 647-748-7424
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABEER ABDU MOTEEEI AL-GASIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-GASIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2005 to 04 Dec 2005
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2007 to 31 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2008 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2009 to 31 May 2009
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009