Al-Ghadir, Muaz Hidar A (CPSO#: 85301)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 06 Jul 2006 to 30 Aug 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012