Al-Ghamdi, Ghormullah Abdullah (CPSO#: 68609)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Nov 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Nov 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 16 Nov 1996
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Nov 1996