Al-Ghamdi, Mohammed Joman Mohammed Al-Mola (CPSO#: 75479)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 11 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2003