Al-Ghamdi, Saeed Mahfouz Saeed (CPSO#: 75935)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 08 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 08 Jan 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Jan 2003