Al-Ghamdi, Shabab Saad Saeed Al-Najm (CPSO#: 75476)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 11 Jul 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Jul 2001 to 11 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jul 2002