Al-Ghanem, Faisal Abdullah Mansour (CPSO#: 69602)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Oct 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Oct 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 22 Oct 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 1996