Al-Ghanim, Khawla Khalifa Ali (CPSO#: 102000)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 23 Nov 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Aug 2016
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2016