Al-Ghofaili, Fahad Saleh Ibrahim (CPSO#: 69607)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 01 Aug 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 01 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 7 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 02 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005