Al-Gowaifly, Khaleel Ibrahim Saleh (CPSO#: 67530)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 03 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Sep 1994
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1994 to 30 Sep 1995
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 04 Nov 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 05 Nov 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 04 Nov 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 05 Nov 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 04 Nov 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Nov 1998