Al-Haddad, Sahar Faik Hameed (CPSO#: 79911)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Baghdad, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Anatomical Pathology
711 Concession St
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 42040
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAHAR FAIK HAMEED AL-HADDAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HADDAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2003