Al-Hadhrami, Zeyana Talib Hamood (CPSO#: 108763)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Queen's University
70 Barrie Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2543
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

94 Stuart street
Department of Medicine, Etherington
Room 3033
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Canada
Phone: (613) 533-2623
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Oman

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZEYANA TALIB HAMOOD AL-HADHRAMI shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. AL-HADHRAMI is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. AL-HADHRAMI shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. AL-HADHRAMI is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. AL-HADHRAMI shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. AL-HADHRAMI is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. AL-HADHRAMI no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 25 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018