Al-Hajjaj, Aisha Nasser Abdulla (CPSO#: 78495)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2002 to 31 Jul 2003
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2003 to 31 Jul 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2004 to 27 Aug 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2004 to 27 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Aug 2005 to 28 Feb 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2006