Al-Hajry, Mohammad Al-Hameedi Mohammad Mejeb (CPSO#: 84189)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 08 May 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013