Al-Hamaid, Fawaz Mohammad (CPSO#: 73307)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 28 May 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Mar 1999 to 24 Mar 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Mar 2000 to 24 Mar 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Mar 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 24 Mar 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Mar 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 24 Mar 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Mar 2003 to 24 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2005