Al-Hamid, Sameer Masoud (CPSO#: 69722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO BOX 22490
Saudi Arabia
Riyadh 11422
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966504166117
Fax: (905) 858-1399
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

PO BOX 22490
RIYADH 11422
Saudi Arabia
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +966504166117
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMEER MASOUD AL-HAMID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HAMID is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2009