Al-Hammadi, Abdullah M A H (CPSO#: 81348)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2004 to 22 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 14 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 15 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009