Al-Harbi, Abdulaziz Abdullah Mabrook (CPSO#: 68492)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 15 Jun 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 02 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 02 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999