Al-Harbi, Hatem Hamed Jaber Al-Mowaraie (CPSO#: 80926)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 07 Jun 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PEAP - Resident - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 29 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 30 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 29 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 30 Jul 2006 to 29 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 30 Jul 2007 to 29 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 30 Jul 2008 to 29 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 30 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010