Al-Harbi, Khalid Eid Abdullah (CPSO#: 69568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tawam Hospital
Al Ain
Abu Dhabi
United Arab Emirates
Al Ain 15258
United Arab Emirates
Phone: +971567073888
Fax: +97137072894

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia
United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 31 Jul 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 27 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALID EID ABDULLAH AL-HARBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HARBI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 26 Jun 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2007