Al-Harbi, Othman Rabeh A (CPSO#: 78601)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 10 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 09 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 10 Oct 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 09 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 10 Oct 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 10 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2005 to 10 Oct 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2006 to 10 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2014