Al-Harbi, Talal Muteb J A (CPSO#: 82053)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2004 to 07 Jan 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 08 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008