Al-Harthi, Majed Mohia Seraj (CPSO#: 79228)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 May 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2010