Al-Hashmi, Ibrahim Murtada Mohammed (CPSO#: 63864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
107 - 81 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W3
Phone: (416) 234-5442
Fax: (416) 234-1483
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Fax: (416) 234-1483
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Al-Hashmi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Al-Hashmi ( CPSO# 63864 )

Business Address:
Suite 107
81 The East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z 5W3
Phone Number: (416) 234-5442

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IBRAHIM MURTADA MOHAMMED AL-HASHMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HASHMI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1998