Al-Hayik, Ali Ibrahim Khaleel (CPSO#: 78428)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A0 401
820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB  R3A 1R9
Phone: (204) 787-1219

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 11 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 2003 to 11 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 11 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Dec 2005 to 11 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 11 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009