Al-Hazzani, Waleed Ali A (CPSO#: 84228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 32800
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 18 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALEED ALI A AL-HAZZANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-HAZZANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2006 to 29 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 30 Jun 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 04 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2007 to 04 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2008 to 04 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2009 to 04 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2010 to 04 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2011 to 04 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 05 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 May 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013